Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1991-10-08) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Egon Coordes (until 1991-10-14) | 1944-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Raimond Aumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-10-12 | ||||
Sven Scheuer (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | ||||
Gerald Hillringhaus (from 1990-07-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-06-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Markus Munch (from 1990-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-07 | ||||
Roland Grahammer (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | ||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Ulf Kliche (from 1990-07-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-08-07 | ||||
Jurgen Kohler (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Stefan Reuter (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Rainer Aigner (from 1990-07-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-09-04 | ||||
Thomas Kastenmaier (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Sternkopf (from 1990-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-04-21 | ||||
Christian Ziege (from 1990-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-02-01 | ||||
Olaf Thon (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1992-12-31) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Stefan Effenberg (from 1990-07-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | ||||
Manfred Bender (until 1992-06-30) | 1966-05-24 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Allan Nielsen (from 1990-07-01) (until 1991-06-30) | 1971-03-13 | ||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Thorsten Worsdorfer (from 1990-07-01) (until 1990-11-30) | 1967-09-29 | ||||
Ludwig Kogl (until 1990-08-04) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Hansi Flick (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-02-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-01-11 | ||||
Brian Laudrup (from 1990-07-01) (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | ||||
Alan McInally (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-02-10 | ||||
Radmilo Mihajlovic (until 1990-12-31) | 1964-11-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1990-07-31 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |