Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eberhard Vogel (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-11-09) | 1943-04-08 | ||||
Michael Lorkowski (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-02-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hannes Baldauf (from 1992-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1938-03-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Jorg-Uwe Klutz (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-07-27 | ||||
Axel Sundermann (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-23 | ||||
Dejan Raickovic (from 1992-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-10-27 | ||||
Michael Schjonberg (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-01-19 | ||||
Roman Wojcicki (until 1993-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Bernd Heemsoth (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-10-10 | ||||
Toni Zlatkov (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-07-22 | ||||
Axel Bernd (until 1992-06-30) | 1968-11-21 | ||||
Meik Ehlert (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-06-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christof Babatz (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-03 | ||||
Reinhold Daschner (from 1992-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-16 | ||||
Frank Ellermann (from 1992-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-07-10 | ||||
Martin Groth (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-10-20 | ||||
Lars Reuther (from 1992-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-12-17 | ||||
Hakan Bicici (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-08-01 | ||||
Dennis Weiland (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1974-08-30 | ||||
Reinhold Mathy (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-04-12 | ||||
Michael Koch (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | ||||
Jorg Kretzschmar (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-12-09 | ||||
Andre Sirocks (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | ||||
Oliver Freund (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-04-15 | ||||
Karsten Surmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Jens Friedemann (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-11-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Carsten Mutze (from 1992-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-09-19 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1994-12-17) | 1959-11-30 | ||||
Andre Breitenreiter (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-10-02 | ||||
Niclas Weiland (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-07-22 | ||||
Milos Delmas (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-06-04 | ||||
Sergej Barbarez (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-09-17 | ||||
Jochen Heisig (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Patrick Grun (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Uwe Jursch (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-06-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1992-08-11 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |