Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 1993-12-10) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1993-06-30) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 1993-06-30) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Eike Immel (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-11-27 | ||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
22 | Eberhard Trautner (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | ||||
Alexander Strehmel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Uwe Schneider (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | ||||
Harald Preuss (until 1993-06-30) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Jens Keller (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-11-24 | ||||
Nils Schmaler (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
6 | Guido Buchwald (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | |||
13 | Gunther Schafer (until 1996-09-30) | 1962-06-09 | |||
14 | Thomas Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
25 | Slobodan Dubajic (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-02-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marc Kienle (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (from 1992-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Oliver Otto (from 1992-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-11-21 | ||||
Thomas Sobotzik (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1974-10-16 | ||||
Andre Golke (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Maurizio Gaudino (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Jovica Simanic (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-08 | ||||
Jurgen Kramny (until 1992-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Matthias Sammer (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | ||||
Michael Mayer (until 1992-06-30) | 1970-10-17 | ||||
7 | Andreas Buck (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-29 | |||
31 | Ludwig Kogl (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Adrian Knup (from 1992-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-07-02 | ||||
Fritz Walter (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | ||||
Markus Beierle (from 1992-07-01) (until 1993-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | ||||
Manfred Kastl (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-09-23 | ||||
Olaf Schmaler (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
23 | Marcus Ziegler (from 1992-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1992-08-11 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |