Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Werner Friese (from 1993-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-03-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Dragoslav Stepanovic (from 1993-05-04) (until 1995-04-07) | 1948-08-30 | ||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1993-05-04) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 1996-04-27) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jens Melzig (from 1993-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Bernard Schuiteman (from 1993-07-01) (until 1994-12-31) | 1973-10-03 | ||||
Franco Foda (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Martin Kree (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-27 | ||||
Stephan Hanke (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-10-19 | ||||
Jurgen Radschuweit (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-12-04 | ||||
Uwe Stover (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | ||||
3 | Markus Happe (until 1999-12-05) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Becker (from 1993-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-09-26 | ||||
Heiko Scholz (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Pavel Hapal (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-07-27 | ||||
Rene Rydlewicz (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-07-18 | ||||
Andreas Fischer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-20 | ||||
Markus von Ahlen (until 1993-12-31) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Matthias Stammann (until 1993-10-31) | 1968-05-08 | ||||
Guido Hoffmann (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-12-20 | ||||
Andre Gumprecht (until 1993-06-30) | 1974-12-26 | ||||
5 | Ioan Lupescu (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-09 | |||
8 | Bernd Schuster (from 1993-07-01) (until 1996-12-31) | 1959-12-22 | |||
15 | Mario Tolkmitt (until 1996-12-31) | 1970-10-30 | |||
30 | Jupp Nehl (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-06-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andreas Thom (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-09-07 | ||||
Jorg Nowotny (from 1993-07-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-12-27 | ||||
Heiko Herrlich (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | ||||
7 | Paulo Sergio (from 1993-07-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-06-02 | |||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1993-08-01 00:00 |
6 : 7 PSO |
Schema Compare |