Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1995-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Reck (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | ||||
1 | Oliver Reck (from 1993-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
16 | Hans-Jurgen Gundelach (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-29 | |||
20 | Frank Rost (from 1993-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andree Wiedener (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-03-14 | ||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Dietmar Beiersdorfer (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-16 | ||||
Rune Bratseth (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-03-19 | ||||
Bernd Goldschmidt (from 1993-07-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-04-24 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Uli Borowka (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-05-19 | ||||
Gunnar Sauer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | ||||
6 | Uli Borowka (from 1993-07-01) (until 1995-12-31) | 1962-05-19 | |||
19 | Gunnar Sauer (from 1993-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Herzog (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-09-10 | ||||
Martin Przondziono (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Uwe Harttgen (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Thorsten Legat (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-11-07 | ||||
Dieter Eilts (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | ||||
Chad Deering (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-09-02 | ||||
Thomas Wolter (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Marco Bode (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | ||||
5 | Dieter Eilts (from 1993-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | |||
7 | Mario Basler (from 1993-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | |||
8 | Mirko Votava (until 1996-12-08) | 1956-04-25 | |||
11 | Marco Bode (from 1993-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | |||
15 | Thomas Wolter (from 1993-07-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | |||
21 | Lars Unger (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-09-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Wynton Rufer (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-12-29 | ||||
Klaus Allofs (until 1993-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Stefan Kohn (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-10-09 | ||||
Kay Wenschlag (until 1993-06-30) | 1970-02-25 | ||||
9 | Bernd Hobsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-05-07 | |||
18 | Frank Neubarth (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-07-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1993-08-01 00:00 |
6 : 7 PSO |
Schema Compare |