Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Krauss (until 1996-12-07) | 1957-05-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dimo Wache (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-11-01 | ||||
1 | Uwe Kamps (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-06-12 | |||
22 | Jorg Kaessmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-08-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Frontzeck (from 1995-07-01) (until 1995-12-31) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Holger Fach (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Marc Beckers (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-10-19 | ||||
3 | Michael Klinkert (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-07-07 | |||
4 | Patrik Andersson (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-08-18 | |||
6 | Jorg Neun (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | |||
15 | Stephan Schulz-Winge (from 1995-07-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-13 | |||
18 | Joachim Stadler (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-01-15 | |||
19 | Thomas Kastenmaier (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-05-31 | |||
23 | Thomas Eichin (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Hausweiler (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-04-15 | ||||
Dietmar Hirsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-12-08 | ||||
Andreas Bluhm (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-12-21 | ||||
2 | Thomas Hoersen (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-01-11 | |||
7 | Karlheinz Pflipsen (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-10-31 | |||
8 | Peter Wynhoff (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-29 | |||
10 | Stefan Effenberg (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | |||
13 | Martin Schneider (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-11-24 | |||
14 | Peter Nielsen (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-06-03 | |||
16 | Dirk Wolf (from 1995-07-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-08-04 | |||
17 | Davor Krznaric (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-08-22 | |||
20 | Christian Hochstatter (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-10-19 | |||
21 | Michael Sternkopf (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-04-21 | |||
29 | Marcel Ketelaer (from 1995-07-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-11-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mac Younga-Mouhani (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-08-01 | ||||
Bachirou Salou (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Martin Max (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-08-07 | ||||
9 | Martin Dahlin (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-04-16 | |||
11 | Heiko Herrlich (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | |||
12 | Max Huiberts (from 1995-07-01) (until 1996-12-15) | 1970-11-17 | |||
24 | Jorgen Pettersson (from 1995-11-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-09-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |