Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Klopp (until 2015-06-30) | 1967-06-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Zeljko Buvac (until 2015-06-30) | 1961-09-13 | ||||
Peter Krawietz (until 2015-06-30) | 1972-05-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Weidenfeller (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
20 | Mitchell Langerak (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-22 | |||
41 | Johannes Focher (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-01-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Julian Koch (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-11-11 | |||
2 | Lasse Sobiech (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-01-18 | |||
4 | Neven Subotic (until 2017-01-25) | 1988-12-10 | |||
15 | Mats Hummels (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-16 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
24 | Chris Lowe (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-01-11) | 1989-04-16 | |||
25 | Patrick Owomoyela (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-11-05 | |||
26 | Lukasz Piszczek (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-06-03 | |||
27 | Felipe Santana (until 2013-06-30) | 1986-03-17 | |||
28 | Marc Hornschuh (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-01-27) | 1991-03-02 | |||
29 | Marcel Schmelzer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
44 | Marc Hornschuh (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
6 | Florian Kringe (until 2012-06-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
7 | Moritz Leitner (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-12-08 | |||
8 | Antonio da Silva (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1978-06-13 | |||
8 | Nuri Sahin (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | |||
11 | Mario Gotze (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
14 | Ivan Perisic (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-01-05) | 1989-02-02 | |||
14 | Markus Feulner (until 2011-06-30) | 1982-02-12 | |||
16 | Jakub Blaszczykowski (until 2015-08-31) | 1985-12-14 | |||
19 | Kevin Grosskreutz (until 2015-09-02) | 1988-07-19 | |||
21 | Ilkay Gundogan (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-10-24 | |||
22 | Sven Bender (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-04-27 | |||
23 | Shinji Kagawa (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-03-17 | |||
30 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2011-01-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
31 | Marvin Bakalorz (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
31 | Mario Gotze (until 2011-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
32 | Antonio da Silva (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-06-13 | |||
36 | Mario Vrancic (from 2011-12-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1989-05-23 | |||
36 | Yasin Oztekin (until 2011-01-02) | 1987-03-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Robert Lewandowski (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-08-21 | |||
9 | Robert Lewandowski (from 2011-07-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-21 | |||
10 | Mohamed Zidan (until 2012-01-30) | 1981-12-11 | |||
13 | Damien Le Tallec (until 2012-01-30) | 1990-04-19 | |||
18 | Lucas Barrios (until 2012-05-31) | 1984-11-13 | |||
28 | Daniel Ginczek (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
37 | Terrence Boyd (from 2011-10-22) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-16 | |||
39 | Marco Stiepermann (until 2011-06-30) | 1991-02-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-23 20:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |