Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Bernd Dreher (until 2012-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Huub Stevens (from 2011-09-27) (until 2012-12-15) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (from 2011-09-22) (until 2011-09-26) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Ralf Rangnick (from 2011-03-21) (until 2011-09-21) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Seppo Eichkorn (from 2011-03-17) (until 2011-03-20) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 2011-03-16) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 2013-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Markus Gisdol (from 2011-03-23) (until 2012-12-15) | 1969-08-17 | ||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 2011-03-17) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ralf Fahrmann (from 2011-07-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
1 | Manuel Neuer (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-03-27 | |||
33 | Mathias Schober (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-04-08 | |||
34 | Timo Hildebrand (from 2011-10-21) (until 2014-06-30) | 1979-04-05 | |||
36 | Lars Unnerstall (until 2014-01-23) | 1990-07-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Hans Sarpei (until 2012-06-30) | 1976-06-28 | |||
3 | Sergio Escudero (until 2013-01-24) | 1989-09-02 | |||
4 | Benedikt Howedes (until 2017-08-30) | 1988-02-29 | |||
5 | Nicolas Plestan (until 2011-06-30) | 1981-06-02 | |||
6 | Tim Hoogland (until 2012-06-30) | 1985-06-11 | |||
13 | Lukas Schmitz (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-10-13 | |||
14 | Kyriakos Papadopoulos (until 2014-08-03) | 1992-02-23 | |||
21 | Christoph Metzelder (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
22 | Atsuto Uchida (until 2017-08-21) | 1988-03-27 | |||
23 | Christian Fuchs (from 2011-07-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-04-07 | |||
23 | Danilo Avelar (from 2011-01-23) (until 2011-06-30) | 1989-06-09 | |||
24 | Christian Pander (until 2011-06-30) | 1983-08-28 | |||
32 | Joel Matip (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-08 | |||
38 | Alban Sabah (from 2011-12-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1992-06-22 | |||
39 | Marvin Pachan (until 2011-06-30) | 1990-04-11 | |||
43 | Nils Zander (from 2011-12-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1993-02-06 | |||
43 | Tore Reginiussen (until 2011-03-15) | 1986-04-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Junmin Hao (until 2011-07-07) | 1987-03-24 | |||
10 | Lewis Holtby (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-01-27) | 1990-09-18 | |||
10 | Ali Karimi (from 2011-01-31) (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-11-08 | |||
10 | Ivan Rakitic (until 2011-01-27) | 1988-03-10 | |||
11 | Alexander Baumjohann (until 2012-08-20) | 1987-01-23 | |||
12 | Marco Hoger (from 2011-07-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-16 | |||
12 | Peer Kluge (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
13 | Jermaine Jones (from 2011-07-01) (until 2014-01-29) | 1981-11-03 | |||
16 | Jan Moravek (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-01-01) | 1989-11-01 | |||
17 | Jefferson Farfan (until 2015-08-14) | 1984-10-26 | |||
18 | Jurado (until 2012-08-30) | 1986-06-29 | |||
20 | Vasilis Pliatsikas (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-04-14 | |||
23 | Jermaine Jones (until 2011-01-17) | 1981-11-03 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
27 | Ciprian Deac (until 2011-06-30) | 1986-02-16 | |||
28 | Christoph Moritz (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
30 | Lewan Qenia (until 2012-06-30) | 1990-10-18 | |||
31 | Julian Draxler (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-09-20 | |||
40 | Anthony Annan (from 2011-01-30) (until 2011-08-21) | 1986-07-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Raul (until 2012-06-30) | 1977-06-27 | |||
8 | Ciprian Marica (from 2011-07-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-10-02 | |||
9 | Edu (until 2011-08-31) | 1981-11-30 | |||
15 | Angelos Charisteas (from 2011-01-30) (until 2011-06-30) | 1980-02-09 | |||
19 | Mario Gavranovic (until 2011-08-30) | 1989-11-24 | |||
20 | Teemu Pukki (from 2011-08-31) (until 2013-08-30) | 1990-03-29 | |||
25 | Klaas-Jan Huntelaar (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-08-12 | |||
26 | Andreas Wiegel (from 2011-07-01) (until 2012-07-31) | 1991-07-21 | |||
26 | Erik Jendrisek (until 2011-01-19) | 1986-10-26 | |||
29 | Philipp Hofmann (from 2011-12-14) (until 2012-07-29) | 1993-03-30 | |||
37 | Marco Quotschalla (until 2011-06-30) | 1988-07-25 | |||
39 | Alexander Langlitz (from 2011-12-14) (until 2012-06-30) | 1991-02-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2011-07-23 20:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |