Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Andreas Bellon (until 2014-06-30) | 1968-02-17 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Saban Uzun (from 2013-12-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-14 | ||||
Alexander Schick (from 2014-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
Niko Koutroubis (until 2013-12-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Torhüterin | |||||
1 | Saskia Frensch (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-02-23 | |||
12 | Analena Kramer (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-11-13 | |||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Simone Holder (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-12-26 | |||
12 | Annalena Kramer (from 2013-10-13) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-11-13 | |||
13 | Kristina Schnull (until 2014-06-30) | 1977-03-09 | |||
25 | Antonia Knupfer (from 2014-02-23) (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
33 | Alisa Geiger (until 2013-12-31) | 1996-08-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lea Kronmuller (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-08-26 | |||
3 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
3 | Bianca Brosamle (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
4 | Selin Munz (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-05-04 | |||
4 | Selin Munz (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-05-04 | |||
5 | Bianca Blochl (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-24 | |||
5 | Jana Siegle (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-02-16 | |||
11 | Michelle Worner (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-25 | |||
14 | Maximiliane Rall (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-11-18 | |||
19 | Isabel Schlipf (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-05 | |||
21 | Julia Becker (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-30 | |||
24 | Pia Schmid (from 2014-02-23) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-22 | |||
26 | Jasmin Ballach (from 2014-02-23) (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-11-26 | |||
28 | Paula Vorbeck (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Magdalena Kraft (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | ||||
6 | Tamina Stecinsky (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-09-19 | |||
6 | Lisa Rinderknecht (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
6 | Tamina Stecinsky (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-09-19 | |||
7 | Nicole Loipersberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-01-01 | |||
8 | Anja Selensky (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-05 | |||
9 | Fabienne Rudy (from 2014-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-10-09 | |||
9 | Marie-Therese Weymer (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-08-03 | |||
11 | Alice Handschuh (until 2014-06-30) | 1999-10-05 | |||
11 | Selina Martens (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-01-09 | |||
13 | Emilie Rapp (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-02-08 | |||
14 | Jule Wilhelm (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-04-19 | |||
15 | Emilie Rapp (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-08 | |||
15 | Magdalena Kraft (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
16 | Natalie Hezel (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-24 | |||
17 | Athanasia Moraitou (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-04-02 | |||
17 | Gina Rilling (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
17 | Athanasia Moraitou (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-04-02 | |||
18 | Gina Rilling (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-12-24 | |||
18 | Meike Bessner (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-07-15 | |||
19 | Stefanie Grimm (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-10 | |||
20 | Franziska Herrmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1999-05-26 | |||
20 | Anna-Lena Vollmer (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-02 | |||
20 | Maike Ullrich (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-02-21 | |||
21 | Julia Schneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | |||
22 | Aline Bohringer (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
22 | Elena Hildebrand (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-10-13 | |||
22 | Anna-Celina Schmid (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-05-15 | |||
23 | Lena Sender (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-02 | |||
23 | Lena Sender (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-07-02 | |||
26 | Bianca Uhl (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-08-01 | |||
27 | Bianca Uhl (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-08-01 | |||
29 | Carina Enoch (from 2014-02-23) (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-04-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Josephine Leschik (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-03-13 | ||||
Fabienne Rudy (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1998-10-09 | ||||
2 | Sandra Borowski (from 2013-10-20) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
2 | Sandra Borowski (until 2014-06-30) | 1997-03-06 | |||
9 | Anna Vidovenyecz (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-15 | |||
11 | Selina Martens (until 2015-06-30) | 1998-01-09 | |||
16 | Nina Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-21 | |||
18 | Amelie Schroder (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-02-12 | |||
29 | Julia Steger (from 2014-06-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-08-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2013-09-08 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-09-15 11:00 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2013-10-03 14:00 |
8 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-06 14:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-13 14:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-10-20 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2013-11-02 12:00 |
12 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-11-10 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-01 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-12-08 14:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-02-23 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-02 14:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-16 11:00 |
12 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2014-03-19 15:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-03-30 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2014-04-21 11:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-04-27 14:00 |
7 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-04 14:00 |
0 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-11 14:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-05-25 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-06-01 14:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-06-08 14:00 |
7 : 0 |
Schema Compare |