Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Worle (until 2019-06-30) | 1982-02-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Roman Langer (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
31 | Manuela Zinsberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-10-19 | |||
32 | Tinja-Riikka Korpela (until 2017-12-17) | 1986-05-05 | |||
41 | Fabienne Weber (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-11-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gina Lewandowski (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-04-13 | |||
5 | Caroline Abbe (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-13 | |||
6 | Katharina Baunach (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-18 | |||
15 | Nora Holstad Berge (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-26 | |||
19 | Carina Wenninger (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
20 | Leonie Maier (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-09-29 | |||
21 | Raffaella Manieri (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-11-21 | |||
25 | Viktoria Schnaderbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Anita Wimmer (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-09-06 | ||||
4 | Veronica Boquete (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-04-09 | |||
7 | Melanie Behringer (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
8 | Melanie Leupolz (until 2020-08-26) | 1994-04-14 | |||
9 | Vanessa Burki (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-04-01 | |||
14 | Sarah Romert (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-12-13 | |||
16 | Claire Falknor (from 2016-01-11) (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-12 | |||
22 | Jenny Gaugigl (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-08-22 | |||
23 | Ricarda Walkling (until 2016-08-03) | 1997-03-19 | |||
27 | Laura Feiersinger (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-05 | |||
28 | Kristie Mewis (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-25 | |||
33 | Sara Dabritz (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Melike Pekel (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-04-14 | ||||
10 | Vivianne Miedema (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-07-15 | |||
11 | Lena Lotzen (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-11 | |||
13 | Mana Iwabuchi (until 2017-03-31) | 1993-03-18 | |||
16 | Katie Stengel (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-29 | |||
17 | Eunice Beckmann (until 2016-05-03) | 1992-02-08 | |||
18 | Lisa Evans (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-05-21 | |||
29 | Nicole Rolser (until 2020-08-31) | 1992-02-07 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Isabella Hartig (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-08-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2015-08-28 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-09-06 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-09-11 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-04 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-11 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-10-18 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-11-01 11:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-11-15 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 2015-11-20 19:15 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-06 14:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-13 14:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-12-20 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-14 14:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-02-20 12:15 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-02-28 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-03-19 14:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-03-26 13:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-04-17 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-04-24 11:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-01 14:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2016-05-08 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2016-05-16 14:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |