Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sepp Maier (until 2008-06-30) | 1944-02-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Giovanni Trapattoni (until 1998-06-30) | 1939-03-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1997-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Kahn (until 2008-06-30) | 1969-06-15 | |||
12 | Sven Scheuer (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | |||
22 | Bernd Dreher (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Markus Babbel (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-09-08 | |||
3 | Markus Munch (until 1998-01-25) | 1972-09-07 | |||
4 | Samuel Kuffour (from 1997-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-03 | |||
4 | Oliver Kreuzer (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-11-13 | |||
5 | Thomas Helmer (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | |||
10 | Lothar Matthaus (until 2000-03-10) | 1961-03-21 | |||
11 | Bixente Lizarazu (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
15 | Dennis Grassow (from 1997-07-01) (until 1997-11-30) | 1971-10-10 | |||
15 | Samuel Kuffour (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-09-03 | |||
28 | Frank Wiblishauser (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
29 | Christian Saba (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | |||
30 | Alexander Bugera (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1978-08-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Christian Nerlinger (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-21 | |||
7 | Mehmet Scholl (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-10-16 | |||
8 | Thomas Strunz (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | |||
11 | Marcel Witeczek (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
13 | Mario Basler (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | |||
14 | Mario Basler (from 1997-07-01) (until 1999-11-14) | 1968-12-18 | |||
16 | Dietmar Hamann (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-27 | |||
17 | Thorsten Fink (from 1997-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | |||
17 | Christian Ziege (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-02-01 | |||
18 | Michael Tarnat (from 1997-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | |||
23 | Frank Gerster (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-04-15 | |||
24 | Stefan Leitl (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
29 | Stefan Leitl (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | |||
31 | David Jarolim (from 1997-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Giovane Elber (from 1997-07-01) (until 2003-08-27) | 1972-07-23 | |||
14 | Carsten Lakies (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-01-08 | |||
18 | Jurgen Klinsmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-07-30 | |||
19 | Carsten Jancker (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-28 | |||
20 | Ruggiero Rizzitelli (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | |||
21 | Alexander Zickler (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-28 | |||
32 | Emanuel Bentil (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-12-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1997-07-23 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1997-07-26 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |