Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Toni Schumacher (until 1998-06-30) | 1954-03-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Nevio Scala (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1947-11-22 | ||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 1997-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 1998-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefan Klos (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-08-16 | |||
12 | Wolfgang de Beer (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Rene Schneider (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-02-01 | |||
5 | Julio Cesar (until 1998-06-30) | 1963-03-08 | |||
6 | Matthias Sammer (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
7 | Stefan Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | |||
15 | Jurgen Kohler (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | |||
16 | Martin Kree (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-01-27 | |||
17 | Jorg Heinrich (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-06 | |||
23 | Jorg Sauerland (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-12-24 | |||
27 | Wolfgang Feiersinger (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-30 | |||
30 | Benjamin Knoche (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-10-11 | |||
34 | Bjorn Mehnert (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-08-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Knut Reinhardt (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-04-27 | |||
4 | Steffen Freund (until 1999-01-08) | 1970-01-19 | |||
8 | Michael Zorc (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
10 | Andreas Moller (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | |||
14 | Paul Lambert (until 1997-11-06) | 1969-08-07 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
19 | Paulo Sousa (until 1997-12-31) | 1970-08-30 | |||
23 | Rene Tretschok (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | |||
24 | Dennis Weiland (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-08-30 | |||
26 | Frank Riethmann (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-12-09 | |||
29 | Wladimir But (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-09-07 | |||
31 | Dennis Vogt (until 1997-06-30) | 1978-05-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Stephane Chapuisat (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-28 | |||
11 | Heiko Herrlich (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | |||
13 | Bashiru Gambo (from 1997-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-09-24 | |||
13 | Karl-Heinz Riedle (until 1997-07-24) | 1965-09-16 | |||
20 | Scott Booth (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-01-31) | 1971-12-16 | |||
21 | Christian Timm (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
22 | Ibrahim Tanko (until 2001-03-31) | 1977-07-25 | |||
24 | Harry Decheiver (from 1997-11-11) (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-03-08 | |||
28 | Jovan Kirovski (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-03-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1997-07-20 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1997-07-23 19:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |