Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Peter Gadinger (until 2012-03-27) | 1956-07-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Winfried Schafer (until 1998-03-25) | 1950-01-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Slavko Petrovic (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1958-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Tuzyna (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-03-10 | ||||
1 | Claus Reitmaier (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | |||
18 | Simon Jentzsch (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
22 | Simon Jentzsch (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | |||
25 | Martin Fischer (from 1997-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Gunther Metz (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-08-08 | |||
3 | Burkhard Reich (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-12-01 | |||
4 | David Regis (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-12-02 | |||
4 | Michael Wittwer (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-02-18 | |||
5 | Michael Wittwer (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-02-18 | |||
6 | Thomas Ritter (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-10 | |||
7 | Dirk Schuster (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-12-29 | |||
14 | Dubravko Kolinger (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
16 | Thomas Hengen (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-22 | |||
19 | Raphael Krauss (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-06-25 | |||
23 | Dubravko Kolinger (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
36 | Guido Buchwald (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Alex Nyarko (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-10-15 | |||
8 | Gunther Schepens (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-05-04 | |||
8 | Thorsten Fink (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | |||
10 | Thomas Hassler (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | |||
15 | Markus Bahr (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-10 | |||
21 | Michael Tarnat (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | |||
24 | Timo Haas (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-02-08 | |||
25 | Jochen Horner (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-05-18 | |||
26 | Martin Jung (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-09-11 | |||
27 | Peter Jung (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-09-22 | |||
29 | Jens Baumer (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-08-09 | |||
29 | Matthias Predojevic (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-11-14 | |||
31 | Oktay Kuday (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-08-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Adrian Knup (from 1997-07-01) (until 1997-12-31) | 1968-07-02 | ||||
9 | Radoslaw Gilewicz (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-05-08 | |||
11 | Christian Wuck (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | |||
12 | Sean Dundee (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-12-07 | |||
13 | Markus Schroth (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-01-25 | |||
14 | Eberhard Carl (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | |||
17 | Marc Keller (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | |||
18 | Timur Eroglu (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-03-22 | |||
20 | Sergej Kirjakow (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | |||
26 | Rolf-Christel Guie-Mien (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-10-28 | |||
28 | Mike Bodenstein (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-09-17 | |||
28 | Igli Tare (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-07-25 | |||
32 | Sven Eller (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1979-09-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1997-07-18 20:30 |
6 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1997-07-22 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |