Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Joachim Low (until 1998-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Franz Wohlfahrt (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-07-01 | |||
25 | Marc Ziegler (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-06-13 | |||
27 | Eberhard Trautner (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
28 | Eberhard Trautner (from 1997-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Martin Spanring (from 1997-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-10-14 | |||
2 | Hendrik Herzog (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | |||
4 | Thomas Berthold (until 2001-01-16) | 1964-11-12 | |||
5 | Frank Verlaat (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-03-05 | |||
14 | Thomas Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
17 | Marco Grimm (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-06-16 | |||
18 | Michael Oelkuch (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-02-05 | |||
21 | Jochen Endress (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | |||
30 | Frank Posch (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-02-21 | |||
33 | Mitko Stojkovski (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-12-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Thorsten Legat (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-11-07 | |||
6 | Murat Yakin (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-15 | |||
7 | Matthias Hagner (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-08-15 | |||
8 | Marco Haber (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-09-21 | |||
10 | Krassimir Balakow (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-03-29 | |||
12 | Danny Schwarz (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-05-11 | |||
16 | Kristijan Dordevic (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
16 | Gerhard Poschner (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-09-23 | |||
19 | Michael Bochtler (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-04-24) | 1975-10-15 | |||
20 | Zvonimir Soldo (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-11-02 | |||
21 | Sebastien Fournier (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-27 | |||
22 | Krisztian Lisztes (from 1997-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-07-02 | |||
22 | Andreas Buck (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-12-29 | |||
23 | Gerhard Poschner (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1969-09-23 | |||
23 | Kristijan Dordevic (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
33 | Krisztian Lisztes (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-07-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sreto Ristic (from 1997-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-02-07 | |||
9 | Giovane Elber (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-07-23 | |||
11 | Fredi Bobic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-30 | |||
15 | Matthias Becker (from 1997-07-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-04-19 | |||
15 | Radoslaw Gilewicz (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-05-08 | |||
18 | Florin Raducioiu (from 1997-08-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-03-17 | |||
24 | Marijo Maric (until 1997-06-30) | 1977-01-12 | |||
27 | Jonathan Akpoborie (from 1997-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-20 | |||
35 | Sreto Ristic (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-02-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1997-07-22 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1997-07-26 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |