Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Werner Friese (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-03-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 2000-10-21) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 2003-02-16) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 2000-10-31) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-03 | |||
30 | Adam Matysek (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-07-14) | 1968-09-01 | |||
31 | Jorg Schmadtke (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-03-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Aaron Mokoena (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1980-11-25 | ||||
2 | Robert Kovac (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-06 | |||
3 | Markus Happe (until 1999-12-05) | 1972-02-11 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
5 | Jens Nowotny (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-11 | |||
6 | Boris Zivkovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-15 | |||
19 | Jan Heintze (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Jorg Reeb (from 1998-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-06 | |||
7 | Niko Kovac (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | |||
8 | Ze Roberto (from 1998-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
10 | Emerson (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-04-04 | |||
12 | Adam Ledwon (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-01-15 | |||
13 | Bent Skammelsrud (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-05-18 | |||
14 | Mehdi Pashazadeh (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-12-29 | |||
16 | Martin Frydek (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | |||
17 | Hans-Peter Lehnhoff (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-07-12 | |||
18 | Frankie Hejduk (from 1998-10-01) (until 2002-08-26) | 1974-08-05 | |||
20 | Dirk Lottner (until 1998-10-31) | 1972-03-04 | |||
21 | Zoran Mamic (from 1998-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-09-30 | |||
22 | Stefan Beinlich (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-01-13 | |||
25 | Andreas Voss (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
25 | Thorsten Nehrbauer (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-01-12 | |||
26 | Thorsten Wittek (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-12-31 | |||
28 | Carsten Ramelow (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-20 | |||
29 | Markus Zuraski (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-03-20 | |||
30 | Manuel Cardoni (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-09-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 | |||
11 | Erik Meijer (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-08-02 | |||
14 | Markus Feldhoff (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-08-29 | |||
15 | Paulo Rink (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-02-21 | |||
24 | Sebastian Helbig (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-04-25 | |||
27 | Thomas Reichenberger (until 1999-12-31) | 1974-10-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1998-07-31 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1998-08-03 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |