Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Stahl (until 1998-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Huub Stevens (until 2002-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Eddy Achterberg (from 1998-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1947-02-21 | ||||
Hubert Neu (until 1999-06-30) | 1953-03-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Reck (from 1998-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
1 | Jens Lehmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | |||
13 | Frode Grodas (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-03-31) | 1964-10-24 | |||
22 | Mathias Schober (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-04-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Van Kerckhoven (from 1998-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-12-14 | |||
2 | Thomas Linke (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | |||
4 | Yves Eigenrauch (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-24 | |||
10 | Olaf Thon (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | |||
12 | Marco van Hoogdalem (until 2004-01-26) | 1972-05-23 | |||
21 | Marco Kurz (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | |||
25 | Johan de Kock (until 1999-12-05) | 1964-10-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Radoslav Latal (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-06 | |||
5 | Sven Kmetsch (from 1998-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | |||
6 | Andreas Muller (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-13 | |||
8 | Ingo Anderbrugge (until 1999-12-31) | 1964-01-02 | |||
13 | Markus Anfang (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-06-12 | |||
14 | Denis Kljujew (until 1998-12-31) | 1973-09-07 | |||
15 | Hami Mandirali (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-07-20 | |||
15 | Arnold Dybek (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-05-04 | |||
16 | Oliver Held (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-09-10 | |||
19 | Mike Buskens (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-03-19 | |||
20 | Jiri Nemec (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-15 | |||
21 | Mark Schierenberg (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | |||
23 | Filip Tapalovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-10-22 | |||
24 | Marc Wilmots (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | |||
27 | Mark Schierenberg (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | |||
28 | Markus Kaya (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-10-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Mickael Goossens (until 1999-12-31) | 1973-11-30 | |||
9 | Youri Mulder (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-23 | |||
11 | Martin Max (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-07 | |||
17 | Miguel Pereira (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-08-23 | |||
18 | Rene Eijkelkamp (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-04-06 | |||
31 | Miguel Pereira (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-08-23 | |||
33 | Sascha Wolf (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1998-08-01 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |