Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2000-03-19) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Gill (from 1998-07-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1965-05-16 | |||
1 | Holger Gehrke (until 1998-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | |||
12 | Thomas Gill (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-05-16 | |||
25 | Gintaras Stauce (from 1998-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-24 | |||
26 | Carsten Kramer (from 1998-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-07-29 | |||
29 | Gintaras Stauce (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Pascal Thuler (from 1998-07-01) (until 1998-12-31) | 1970-01-10 | ||||
2 | Joachim Hopp (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-07-10 | |||
4 | Torsten Wohlert (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-12-10 | |||
5 | Tomasz Hajto (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-10-16 | |||
7 | Slobodan Komljenovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-01-02 | |||
13 | Markus Reiter (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-08-10 | |||
15 | Horst Steffen (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | |||
17 | Torsten Schramm (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
22 | Stefan Emmerling (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-02-10 | |||
27 | Peter Schyrba (from 1998-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-10-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Thomas Hoersen (from 1998-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-11 | |||
3 | Dietmar Hirsch (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-12-08 | |||
6 | Stig Tofting (until 2000-04-24) | 1969-08-14 | |||
10 | Lubomir Moravcik (from 1998-07-01) (until 1998-10-26) | 1965-06-22 | |||
11 | Martin Frydek (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | |||
14 | Marcus Wedau (from 1998-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-12-31 | |||
16 | Marc Kienle (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | |||
17 | Thomas Puschmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-28 | |||
19 | Jorg Neun (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | |||
20 | Michael Zeyer (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | |||
21 | Thomas Vana (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-09 | |||
23 | Adem Kapic (until 1998-12-31) | 1975-04-16 | |||
24 | Carsten Wolters (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-07-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Markus Osthoff (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-11-19 | |||
9 | Erik Andersen (from 1998-07-01) (until 2000-01-15) | 1970-11-14 | |||
9 | Bachirou Salou (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | |||
11 | Alexandru Popovici (until 1998-06-30) | 1977-04-09 | |||
13 | Markus Beierle (from 1998-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | |||
16 | Marius Ebbers (from 1998-07-01) (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-01-04 | |||
18 | Uwe Spies (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-07-08 | |||
25 | Niklas Skoog (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-06-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1998-07-31 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |