Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Gerry Ehrmann (until 2015-06-30) | 1959-02-18 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 2000-10-01) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Stumpf (until 2002-07-22) | 1961-11-26 | ||||
Hubert Neu (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1953-03-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Reinke (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-01-10 | |||
2 | Uwe Gospodarek (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | |||
16 | Uwe Gospodarek (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | |||
25 | Lajos Szucs (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-08-08 | |||
26 | Roman Weidenfeller (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Michael Schjonberg (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-01-19 | |||
4 | Axel Roos (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-08-19 | |||
5 | Samir Kamouna (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-04-02 | |||
6 | Hany Ramzy (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-03-10 | |||
13 | Slobodan Komljenovic (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-01-02 | |||
15 | Janos Hrutka (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-10-26 | |||
16 | Michael Schjonberg (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-01-19 | |||
19 | Oliver Schafer (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-02-27 | |||
20 | Thomas Lechner (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-05-24) | 1979-01-09 | |||
24 | Harry Koch (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | |||
27 | Marco Stark (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1981-07-09 | |||
29 | Roger Lutz (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-07-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Sobotzik (from 1999-07-01) (until 1999-11-30) | 1974-10-16 | ||||
3 | Michael Ballack (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
7 | Marijan Christow (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-07-29 | |||
8 | Martin Wagner (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-02-24 | |||
10 | Ciriaco Sforza (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-03-02 | |||
13 | Pascal Ojigwe (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
17 | Ratinho (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-06-08 | |||
21 | Jeff Strasser (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-10-05 | |||
22 | Andreas Buck (until 2002-01-25) | 1967-12-29 | |||
23 | Thomas Riedl (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-06-18 | |||
27 | Daniel Graf (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-03 | |||
28 | Junior (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-10 | |||
30 | Mario Basler (from 1999-11-15) (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jorgen Pettersson (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-09-29 | |||
11 | Olaf Marschall (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-03-19 | |||
12 | Marco Reich (until 2001-06-30) | 1977-12-30 | |||
14 | Youri Djorkaeff (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-02-12) | 1968-03-09 | |||
18 | Jurgen Rische (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-10-30 | |||
19 | Igli Tare (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-12-31) | 1973-07-25 | |||
20 | Uwe Rosler (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-11-15 | |||
23 | Silvio Adzic (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-09-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-07-10 17:45 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |