Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Werner Friese (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-03-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 2000-10-21) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 2003-02-16) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 2000-10-31) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Adam Matysek (from 1999-08-06) (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | |||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
20 | Frank Juric (from 1999-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-10-28 | |||
23 | Dirk Heinen (until 1999-12-31) | 1970-12-03 | |||
30 | Adam Matysek (until 1999-07-14) | 1968-09-01 | |||
31 | Rudiger Vollborn (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Aaron Mokoena (until 1999-06-30) | 1980-11-25 | ||||
2 | Robert Kovac (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-06 | |||
3 | Markus Happe (until 1999-12-05) | 1972-02-11 | |||
5 | Jens Nowotny (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-11 | |||
6 | Boris Zivkovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-15 | |||
14 | Torben Hoffmann (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-10-27 | |||
19 | Jan Heintze (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-08-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Jorg Reeb (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-06 | |||
7 | Robson Ponte (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-11-06 | |||
7 | Niko Kovac (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | |||
8 | Ze Roberto (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
10 | Emerson (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-04-04 | |||
12 | Adam Ledwon (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-01-15 | |||
13 | Michael Ballack (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
14 | Mehdi Pashazadeh (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-12-29 | |||
17 | Hans-Peter Lehnhoff (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-07-12 | |||
18 | Frankie Hejduk (until 2002-08-26) | 1974-08-05 | |||
19 | Vratislav Gresko (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-10-31) | 1977-07-24 | |||
21 | Zoran Mamic (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-09-30 | |||
22 | Stefan Beinlich (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-01-13 | |||
24 | Daryoush Yazdani (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-06-02 | |||
25 | Bernd Schneider (from 1999-07-01) (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-11-17 | |||
25 | Andreas Voss (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-27 | |||
26 | Landon Donovan (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1982-03-04 | |||
28 | Carsten Ramelow (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 | |||
11 | Erik Meijer (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-08-02 | |||
12 | Thomas Brdaric (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
15 | Paulo Rink (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-02-21 | |||
16 | Miroslaw Spizak (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
27 | Oliver Neuville (from 1999-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-05-01 | |||
27 | Thomas Reichenberger (until 1999-12-31) | 1974-10-14 | |||
30 | Markus Daun (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1999-07-10 17:45 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1999-07-13 18:15 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |