Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Sepp Maier (until 2008-06-30) | 1944-02-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 2004-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 2004-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Kahn (until 2008-06-30) | 1969-06-15 | |||
12 | Sven Scheuer (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-01-19 | |||
22 | Bernd Dreher (until 2003-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | |||
33 | Stefan Wessels (from 1999-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-02-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Markus Babbel (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-09-08 | |||
3 | Bixente Lizarazu (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-12-09 | |||
4 | Samuel Kuffour (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-09-03 | |||
5 | Patrik Andersson (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1971-08-18 | |||
5 | Thomas Helmer (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | |||
10 | Lothar Matthaus (until 2000-03-10) | 1961-03-21 | |||
23 | Frank Wiblishauser (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
25 | Thomas Linke (until 2005-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | |||
30 | Nils-Eric Johansson (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-01-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Michael Wiesinger (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-12-27 | |||
7 | Mehmet Scholl (until 2007-06-30) | 1970-10-16 | |||
8 | Thomas Strunz (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | |||
11 | Stefan Effenberg (until 2002-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | |||
13 | Jens Jeremies (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-03-05 | |||
14 | Mario Basler (until 1999-11-14) | 1968-12-18 | |||
16 | Jens Jeremies (from 1999-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-03-05 | |||
17 | Thorsten Fink (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | |||
18 | Michael Tarnat (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-10-27 | |||
20 | Hasan Salihamidzic (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-01-01 | |||
31 | David Jarolim (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
34 | Andrew Sinkala (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-12-31) | 1979-06-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Giovane Elber (until 2003-08-27) | 1972-07-23 | |||
13 | Paulo Sergio (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-06-02 | |||
19 | Carsten Jancker (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-08-28 | |||
21 | Alexander Zickler (until 2005-06-30) | 1974-02-28 | |||
24 | Roque Santa Cruz (from 1999-07-01) (until 2007-06-27) | 1981-08-16 | |||
24 | Ali Daei (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-03-21 | |||
32 | Emanuel Bentil (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-12-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1999-07-14 19:45 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1999-07-17 17:45 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |