Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Enver Maric (until 2010-06-30) | 1948-04-23 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 2002-02-06) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Bernd Storck (until 2002-02-06) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Gabor Kiraly (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-04-01 | |||
12 | Christian Fiedler (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
28 | Rene Renno (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
29 | Rene Renno (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-02-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Helmer (from 1999-09-01) (until 2000-01-05) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Christian Saba (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | ||||
2 | Hendrik Herzog (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | |||
4 | Dick van Burik (until 2007-06-30) | 1973-11-29 | |||
5 | Kostas Konstantinidis (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-03-13) | 1972-08-31 | |||
6 | Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | |||
17 | Tony Sanneh (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-06-01 | |||
33 | Marko Rehmer (from 1999-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1972-04-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joe Bacak (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-23 | ||||
3 | Rob Maas (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | |||
7 | Sergej Mandreko (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-08-01 | |||
8 | Dariusz Wosz (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
10 | Kjetil Rekdal (until 2000-03-13) | 1968-11-06 | |||
14 | Ante Covic (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-08-31 | |||
16 | Sixten Veit (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
18 | Pal Dardai (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | |||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
20 | Andreas Neuendorf (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
21 | Michael Hartmann (until 2005-01-30) | 1974-07-11 | |||
23 | Rene Tretschok (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | |||
24 | Kai Michalke (from 1999-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-04-05 | |||
26 | Sebastian Deisler (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-01-05 | |||
26 | Andreas Neuendorf (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ali Daei (from 1999-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-21 | |||
9 | Bryan Roy (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-02-12 | |||
11 | Michael Preetz (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | |||
13 | Alphonse Tchami (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-14 | |||
15 | Bryan Roy (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-12-31) | 1970-02-12 | |||
22 | Alex Alves (from 1999-07-01) (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-12-30 | |||
22 | Piotr Reiss (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-06-20 | |||
25 | Ilija Aracic (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-11-15 | |||
27 | Andreas Thom (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-09-07 | |||
31 | Ivica Olic (until 1999-06-30) | 1979-09-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1999-07-11 18:15 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |