Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Werner Friese (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-03-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Berti Vogts (from 2000-11-13) (until 2001-06-30) | 1946-12-30 | ||||
Rudi Voller (from 2000-10-21) (until 2000-11-12) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Christoph Daum (until 2000-10-21) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 2003-02-16) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (from 2000-11-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Roland Koch (until 2000-10-31) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Adam Matysek (until 2001-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | |||
20 | Frank Juric (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-10-28 | |||
22 | Pascal Zuberbuhler (from 2000-07-01) (until 2001-02-28) | 1971-01-08 | |||
31 | Tom Starke (from 2000-07-01) (until 2003-12-21) | 1981-03-18 | |||
31 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 2000-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Robert Kovac (until 2001-06-30) | 1974-04-06 | |||
5 | Jens Nowotny (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-11 | |||
6 | Boris Zivkovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-15 | |||
14 | Torben Hoffmann (until 2000-12-31) | 1974-10-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Neuendorf (from 2000-07-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1975-02-09 | ||||
3 | Marko Babic (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-01-21 | |||
4 | Jorg Reeb (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-01-06 | |||
7 | Robson Ponte (until 2001-06-30) | 1976-11-06 | |||
8 | Ze Roberto (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
10 | Emerson (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-04-04 | |||
13 | Michael Ballack (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
15 | Jurica Vranjes (from 2000-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | |||
17 | Pascal Ojigwe (from 2000-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
18 | Frankie Hejduk (until 2002-08-26) | 1974-08-05 | |||
19 | Vratislav Gresko (until 2000-10-31) | 1977-07-24 | |||
21 | Marquinhos (from 2000-07-01) (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-09-29 | |||
21 | Zoran Mamic (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-09-30 | |||
22 | Stefan Beinlich (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-01-13 | |||
24 | Daryoush Yazdani (until 2000-06-30) | 1977-06-02 | |||
25 | Bernd Schneider (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-11-17 | |||
26 | Landon Donovan (until 2001-06-30) | 1982-03-04 | |||
28 | Carsten Ramelow (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-20 | |||
33 | Anel Dzaka (from 2000-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | |||
39 | Jurica Vranjes (until 2000-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 | |||
11 | Paulo Rink (until 2001-11-19) | 1973-02-21 | |||
12 | Thomas Brdaric (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
16 | Miroslaw Spizak (until 2000-06-30) | 1979-01-13 | |||
23 | Thomas Brdaric (from 2000-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
27 | Oliver Neuville (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-05-01 | |||
30 | Markus Daun (until 2001-12-31) | 1980-09-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2000-07-29 17:45 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |