Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Toni Schumacher (until 2003-06-30) | 1954-03-06 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (until 2003-02-16) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ralf Minge (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1960-10-08 | ||||
Peter Hermann (until 2003-02-16) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Hans Jorg Butt (until 2007-06-30) | 1974-05-28 | |||
20 | Frank Juric (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-10-28 | |||
31 | Tom Starke (until 2003-12-21) | 1981-03-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Lucio (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-05-08 | |||
4 | Juan (from 2002-07-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1979-02-01 | |||
4 | Michael Zepek (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-01-19 | |||
5 | Jens Nowotny (until 2006-06-30) | 1974-01-11 | |||
6 | Boris Zivkovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-11-15 | |||
19 | Lucio (until 2002-06-30) | 1978-05-08 | |||
24 | Emanuel Pogatetz (until 2002-08-30) | 1983-01-16 | |||
35 | Diego Placente (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-04-24 | |||
46 | Mile Bozic (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-11-06 | |||
47 | Thomas Kleine (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-12-28 | |||
51 | Nasir El Kasmi (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-10-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Christoph Preuss (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-08-20) | 1981-07-04 | |||
3 | Marko Babic (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-01-21 | |||
8 | Jan Simak (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-10-13 | |||
8 | Ze Roberto (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-07-06 | |||
10 | Yildiray Basturk (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-12-24 | |||
13 | Daniel Bierofka (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-02-07 | |||
13 | Michael Ballack (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | |||
14 | Hanno Balitsch (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-01-04) | 1981-01-02 | |||
15 | Jurica Vranjes (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-01-30 | |||
17 | Pascal Ojigwe (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-12-11 | |||
18 | Frankie Hejduk (until 2002-08-26) | 1974-08-05 | |||
19 | Marko Babic (from 2002-07-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1981-01-21 | |||
21 | Marquinhos (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-09-29 | |||
25 | Bernd Schneider (until 2009-06-30) | 1973-11-17 | |||
26 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
28 | Carsten Ramelow (until 2008-06-30) | 1974-03-20 | |||
33 | Anel Dzaka (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-19 | |||
34 | Huzeyfe Dogan (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
40 | Thorsten Burkhardt (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-05-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Ulf Kirsten (until 2003-06-30) | 1965-12-04 | |||
11 | Franca (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-08-03) | 1976-03-02 | |||
12 | Dimitar Berbatow (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-01-30 | |||
16 | Ioannis Masmanidis (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-03-09 | |||
23 | Thomas Brdaric (until 2003-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | |||
27 | Oliver Neuville (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-05-01 | |||
57 | Sebastian Schoof (from 2002-08-01) (until 2003-08-30) | 1980-03-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2002-07-24 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2002-07-29 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |