Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (from 2002-07-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Michael Stahl (until 2002-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Matthias Sammer (until 2004-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 2004-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jens Lehmann (until 2003-07-22) | 1969-11-10 | |||
20 | Dr. Philipp Laux (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | |||
26 | Roman Weidenfeller (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-08-06 | |||
34 | Michael Ratajczak (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-04-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Evanilson (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-04-24) | 1975-09-12 | |||
2 | Christian Worns (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
3 | Juan Fernandez (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-01-20) | 1980-03-05 | |||
3 | Evanilson (until 2002-06-30) | 1975-09-12 | |||
4 | Christian Worns (from 2002-07-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1972-05-10 | |||
5 | Jurgen Kohler (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | |||
6 | Jorg Heinrich (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-12-06 | |||
7 | Stefan Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | |||
17 | Dede (until 2011-06-30) | 1978-04-18 | |||
21 | Christoph Metzelder (until 2007-06-30) | 1980-11-05 | |||
23 | Ahmed Madouni (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
38 | Florian Thorwart (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1982-04-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Miroslav Stevic (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | |||
5 | Sebastian Kehl (from 2002-07-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
8 | Torsten Frings (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-11-22 | |||
10 | Tomas Rosicky (until 2006-06-30) | 1980-10-04 | |||
14 | Guy Demel (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-06-13 | |||
15 | Sunday Oliseh (until 2003-01-08) | 1974-09-14 | |||
16 | Sead Kapetanovic (until 2002-01-10) | 1972-01-21 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
19 | Otto Addo (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-06-09 | |||
25 | Sebastian Kehl (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-02-13 | |||
28 | Francis Bugri (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-11-09 | |||
33 | Florian Kringe (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-08-18 | |||
41 | Leandro (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-04-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Jan Koller (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-03-30 | |||
11 | Heiko Herrlich (until 2004-06-30) | 1971-12-03 | |||
12 | Ewerthon (until 2005-06-30) | 1981-06-10 | |||
13 | Giuseppe Reina (until 2004-02-02) | 1972-04-15 | |||
22 | Amoroso (until 2004-03-31) | 1974-07-05 | |||
24 | David Odonkor (from 2002-02-24) (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-02-21 | |||
29 | Jan Derek Sorensen (until 2003-01-31) | 1971-12-28 | |||
31 | Emmanuel Krontiris (until 2003-01-30) | 1983-02-11 | |||
34 | Sahr Senesie (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1985-05-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 2002-07-30 20:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |