Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Neubarth (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-03-25) | 1962-07-29 | ||||
Huub Stevens (until 2002-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Norbert Elgert (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-03-25) | 1957-01-13 | ||||
Holger Gehrke (until 2002-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Rost (from 2002-07-01) (until 2007-01-04) | 1973-06-30 | |||
1 | Oliver Reck (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
13 | Frode Grodas (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-10-24 | |||
27 | Oliver Reck (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
29 | Volkan Unlu (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-07-08 | |||
29 | Toni Tapalovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-10-10 | |||
33 | Christofer Heimeroth (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-08-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Van Kerckhoven (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-12-14 | |||
3 | Anibal Matellan (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-05-08 | |||
4 | Dario Rodriguez (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-09-17 | |||
4 | Yves Eigenrauch (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-24 | |||
6 | Tomasz Hajto (until 2004-06-30) | 1972-10-16 | |||
10 | Olaf Thon (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | |||
12 | Marco van Hoogdalem (until 2004-01-26) | 1972-05-23 | |||
15 | Tomasz Waldoch (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-05-10 | |||
23 | Markus Happe (until 2002-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | |||
25 | Marcel Rozgonyi (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
28 | Fabian Lamotte (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-25 | |||
28 | Sladan Peric (until 2002-06-30) | 1982-04-15 | |||
32 | Benjamin Koch (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-02-15 | |||
36 | Krisztian Szollar (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-08-30 | |||
37 | Christian Pander (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-08-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Sven Kmetsch (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-08-13 | |||
7 | Andreas Moller (until 2003-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | |||
8 | Jorg Bohme (until 2004-12-31) | 1974-01-22 | |||
10 | Gustavo Varela (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-05-14 | |||
16 | Kristijan Dordevic (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-01-06 | |||
17 | Sven Vermant (until 2005-06-30) | 1973-04-04 | |||
18 | Niels Oude Kamphuis (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-11-14 | |||
19 | Mike Buskens (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-03-19 | |||
20 | Christian Poulsen (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-02-28 | |||
20 | Jiri Nemec (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-15 | |||
24 | Marc Wilmots (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | |||
27 | Benjamin Wingerter (until 2002-06-30) | 1983-03-25 | |||
30 | Tamas Hajnal (until 2002-06-30) | 1981-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Youri Mulder (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-23 | |||
11 | Ebbe Sand (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-07-19 | |||
14 | Gerald Asamoah (until 2010-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
21 | Emile Mpenza (until 2003-08-28) | 1978-07-04 | |||
22 | Victor Agali (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-12-29 | |||
26 | Mike Hanke (from 2002-05-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-11-05 | |||
34 | Abdul Iyodo (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
35 | Filip Trojan (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2002-07-29 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2002-08-01 20:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |