Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 2005-12-31) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 2013-05-14) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jakub Wierzchowski (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-04-15 | |||
1 | Frank Rost (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
12 | Jakub Wierzchowski (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-04-15 | |||
16 | Pascal Borel (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-09-26 | |||
31 | Alexander Walke (until 2005-06-30) | 1983-06-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Stefan Blank (until 2003-01-28) | 1977-03-10 | |||
6 | Frank Baumann (until 2009-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
14 | Frank Verlaat (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-03-05 | |||
19 | Viktor Skripnik (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-11-19 | |||
20 | Mladen Krstajic (until 2004-06-30) | 1974-03-04 | |||
23 | Ludovic Magnin (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-04-20 | |||
27 | Christian Schulz (from 2002-07-01) (until 2007-08-29) | 1983-04-01 | |||
28 | Razundara Tjikuzu (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-12-12 | |||
34 | Manuel Friedrich (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-01-20) | 1979-09-13 | |||
36 | Stefan Beckert (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1982-05-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Fabian Ernst (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-05-30 | |||
4 | Fabian Ernst (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-05-30 | |||
4 | Paul Stalteri (until 2002-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
5 | Dieter Eilts (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | |||
7 | Paul Stalteri (from 2002-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | |||
8 | Krisztian Lisztes (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-07-02 | |||
10 | Johan Micoud (from 2002-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-07-24 | |||
11 | Ivica Banovic (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-08-02 | |||
17 | Marco Bode (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | |||
21 | Holger Wehlage (until 2002-12-31) | 1976-07-03 | |||
22 | Torsten Frings (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-11-22 | |||
24 | Tim Borowski (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-05-02 | |||
25 | Philip Salyer (from 2002-07-01) (until 2002-12-31) | 1981-10-30 | |||
26 | Simon Rolfes (until 2002-12-15) | 1982-01-21 | |||
33 | Mike Barten (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Ivan Klasnic (until 2002-06-30) | 1980-01-29 | |||
9 | Angelos Charisteas (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-12-22) | 1980-02-09 | |||
9 | Rade Bogdanovic (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-05-21 | |||
15 | Roberto Silva (until 2002-06-30) | 1976-06-01 | |||
17 | Ivan Klasnic (from 2002-07-01) (until 2008-06-30) | 1980-01-29 | |||
18 | Markus Daun (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1980-09-10 | |||
22 | Marco Reich (from 2002-07-01) (until 2004-01-16) | 1977-12-30 | |||
29 | Blaise Mamoum (from 2002-07-01) (until 2003-01-19) | 1979-12-25 | |||
29 | Joe Di Iorio (until 2002-02-21) | 1982-04-08 | |||
30 | Enrico Kern (until 2002-06-30) | 1979-03-12 | |||
32 | Ailton (until 2004-06-30) | 1973-07-19 | |||
35 | Marco Stier (from 2002-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1984-03-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2002-07-24 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |