Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Ronny Teuber (from 2003-07-01) (until 2007-01-31) | 1965-09-01 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (from 2003-10-23) (until 2004-10-17) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Kurt Jara (until 2003-10-22) | 1950-10-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Werner Melzer (from 2003-10-23) (until 2004-10-17) | 1954-05-02 | ||||
Manfred Linzmaier (until 2003-10-22) | 1962-08-27 | ||||
Armin Reutershahn (until 2003-10-22) | 1960-03-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Pieckenhagen (until 2005-06-30) | 1971-11-15 | |||
16 | Tom Starke (from 2003-12-22) (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-03-18 | |||
28 | Thomas Hillenbrand (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-10-10 | |||
29 | Stefan Wachter (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-04-20 | |||
30 | Carsten Wehlmann (until 2003-01-08) | 1972-06-27 | |||
34 | Michael Frech (from 2003-10-20) (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-03-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marcel Maltritz (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-10-02 | |||
4 | Bastian Reinhardt (from 2003-07-01) (until 2010-06-30) | 1975-11-19 | |||
4 | Ingo Hertzsch (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-07-22 | |||
5 | Nico Jan Hoogma (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-10-26 | |||
8 | Michael Baur (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-04-16 | |||
12 | Lars Jacobsen (until 2004-01-29) | 1979-09-20 | |||
15 | Bjorn Schlicke (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-06-23 | |||
18 | Milan Fukal (until 2004-06-30) | 1975-05-16 | |||
21 | Tomas Ujfalusi (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-03-24 | |||
24 | Stephan Kling (until 2004-06-30) | 1981-03-22 | |||
26 | Boris Leschinski (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-11-07 | |||
28 | Fabian Brocker (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-04-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Christian Rahn (until 2005-01-18) | 1979-06-15 | |||
6 | Raphael Wicky (until 2007-08-22) | 1977-04-26 | |||
7 | Mehdi Mahdavikia (from 2003-07-01) (until 2007-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
7 | Martin Groth (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-10-20 | |||
8 | Collin Benjamin (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | |||
10 | Jorg Albertz (until 2003-02-18) | 1971-01-29 | |||
14 | David Jarolim (from 2003-09-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1979-05-17 | |||
15 | Mehdi Mahdavikia (until 2003-06-30) | 1977-07-24 | |||
16 | Collin Benjamin (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-08-03 | |||
17 | Alexander Meier (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
17 | Richard Kitzbichler (until 2003-06-30) | 1974-01-12 | |||
19 | Roda Antar (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-09-12 | |||
20 | Bernd Hollerbach (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | |||
22 | Stefan Beinlich (from 2003-07-01) (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-01-13 | |||
22 | Cristian Ledesma (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-11-29 | |||
27 | Rodolfo Cardoso (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-10-17 | |||
31 | Alexander Laas (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-05-05 | |||
33 | Christian Streit (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Bernardo Romeo (until 2005-01-06) | 1977-09-10 | |||
10 | Sergej Barbarez (from 2003-08-08) (until 2006-06-30) | 1971-09-17 | |||
11 | Erik Meijer (until 2003-06-30) | 1969-08-02 | |||
13 | Kim Christensen (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-05-08 | |||
14 | Sergej Barbarez (until 2003-08-07) | 1971-09-17 | |||
23 | Marek Heinz (until 2003-01-14) | 1977-08-04 | |||
30 | Eren Sen (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1984-09-28 | |||
32 | Naohiro Takahara (until 2006-06-30) | 1979-06-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2003-07-17 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2003-07-22 19:45 |
1 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 2003-07-28 20:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |