Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Neururer (until 2005-06-30) | 1955-04-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Heinemann (until 2009-09-20) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Nicolas Michaty (until 2006-06-30) | 1973-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Rein van Duijnhoven (until 2006-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
13 | Christian Vander (until 2005-06-30) | 1980-10-24 | |||
31 | Toni Tapalovic (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-01-25) | 1980-10-10 | |||
44 | Toni Tapalovic (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-10-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Michael Bemben (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
3 | Martin Meichelbeck (until 2008-06-30) | 1976-11-21 | |||
4 | Mirko Dickhaut (until 2003-01-12) | 1971-01-11 | |||
5 | Soren Colding (until 2006-06-30) | 1972-09-02 | |||
6 | Raymond Kalla (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-04-24 | |||
12 | Anton Vriesde (until 2004-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
15 | Frank Fahrenhorst (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-09-24 | |||
22 | Michael Bemben (until 2003-06-30) | 1976-01-28 | |||
22 | Thomas Reis (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | |||
24 | Philipp Bonig (from 2003-07-01) (until 2012-06-30) | 1980-03-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Sunday Oliseh (from 2003-01-09) (until 2004-03-01) | 1974-09-14 | |||
7 | Paul Freier (until 2004-06-30) | 1979-07-26 | |||
8 | Thomas Zdebel (from 2003-07-01) (until 2009-01-06) | 1973-05-25 | |||
8 | Sebastian Schindzielorz (until 2003-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | |||
10 | Dariusz Wosz (until 2007-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
14 | Thordur Gudjonsson (until 2005-01-27) | 1973-10-14 | |||
17 | Bjarni Gudjonsson (from 2003-07-01) (until 2004-01-15) | 1979-02-26 | |||
17 | Bjorn Joppe (until 2003-06-30) | 1978-12-13 | |||
18 | Filip Tapalovic (until 2005-06-30) | 1976-10-22 | |||
19 | Dietmar Berchtold (until 2003-01-30) | 1974-08-06 | |||
20 | Miroslav Stevic (from 2003-08-25) (until 2005-01-25) | 1970-01-07 | |||
20 | Sergej Mandreko (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-08-01 | |||
22 | Edu (from 2003-09-01) (until 2006-08-08) | 1981-11-30 | |||
23 | Cristian Fiel (until 2004-01-04) | 1980-03-12 | |||
29 | Alexander Thamm (from 2003-03-01) (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-05-06 | |||
34 | David Zajas (until 2003-06-30) | 1983-05-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Peter Madsen (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1978-04-26 | |||
9 | Thomas Christiansen (until 2003-06-30) | 1973-03-11 | |||
11 | Peter Graulund (until 2003-02-28) | 1976-09-20 | |||
16 | Vahid Hashemian (until 2004-06-30) | 1976-07-21 | |||
19 | Momo Diabang (from 2003-07-01) (until 2005-06-30) | 1979-01-21 | |||
21 | Delron Buckley (until 2004-06-30) | 1977-12-07 | |||
26 | Luciano Velardi (until 2003-06-30) | 1981-08-20 | |||
31 | Marcus Fischer (until 2003-06-30) | 1980-08-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2003-07-16 20:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |