Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Perry Brautigam (until 2014-06-30) | 1963-03-28 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Zorniger (until 2015-02-11) | 1967-10-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Tamas Bodog (until 2014-06-30) | 1970-09-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fabio Coltorti (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-12-03 | |||
12 | Andreas Kerner (until 2013-01-18) | 1988-09-05 | |||
22 | Benjamin Bellot (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-30 | |||
26 | Erik Domaschke (from 2012-10-03) (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-11-11 | |||
33 | Pascal Borel (until 2013-06-30) | 1978-09-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marcus Hoffmann (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-10-12 | |||
3 | Tomasz Wisio (until 2013-06-30) | 1982-01-20 | |||
8 | Tim Sebastian (until 2016-01-14) | 1984-01-17 | |||
14 | Patrick Koronkiewicz (until 2013-08-30) | 1991-03-13 | |||
17 | Umut Kocin (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-06-02 | |||
23 | Niklas Hoheneder (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-08-17 | |||
28 | Fabian Franke (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-03-07 | |||
30 | Christian Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-08-13 | |||
32 | Adrian Mrowiec (until 2012-08-16) | 1983-12-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alexander Siebeck (from 2013-05-12) (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-11-03 | ||||
Rene Legien (from 2013-05-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-03-06 | ||||
4 | Pekka Lagerblom (until 2012-10-08) | 1982-10-19 | |||
5 | Henrik Ernst (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-09-02 | |||
6 | Jerry Karikari (until 2013-05-14) | 1987-07-23 | |||
10 | Thiago Rockenbach (until 2014-01-29) | 1985-02-01 | |||
14 | Daniel Rosin (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-05-18 | |||
15 | Bastian Schulz (until 2013-12-31) | 1985-07-10 | |||
16 | Juri Judt (until 2013-12-11) | 1986-07-24 | |||
18 | Timo Rottger (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-07-12 | |||
21 | Paul Schinke (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-05-16 | |||
24 | Dominik Kaiser (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-09-16 | |||
29 | Sebastian Heidinger (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-01-11 | |||
34 | Clemens Fandrich (from 2013-01-06) (until 2015-01-11) | 1991-01-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Roman Wallner (until 2012-08-29) | 1982-02-04 | |||
11 | Daniel Frahn (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-06-03 | |||
13 | Tom Nattermann (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-04-16 | |||
19 | Matthias Morys (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-03-19 | |||
20 | Stefan Kutschke (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-11-03 | |||
27 | Carsten Kammlott (until 2014-01-15) | 1990-02-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2013-05-29 17:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-06-02 14:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |