Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ramazan Yildirim (from 2013-06-29) (until 2014-01-03) | 1975-09-07 | ||||
Maik Walpurgis (until 2013-06-16) | 1973-10-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ovid Hajou (until 2013-06-16) | 1983-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Bastian Gorrissen (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-07-19 | |||
27 | David Buchholz (until 2013-06-30) | 1984-08-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Wiwerink (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-10-15 | |||
3 | Ronny Surma (until 2013-01-19) | 1988-04-17 | |||
4 | Gerrit Nauber (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-13 | |||
20 | Matthias Tietz (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-02-06 | |||
21 | Michael Hohnstedt (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-05-03 | |||
24 | Tobias Willers (until 2013-06-30) | 1987-04-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Dalibor Gataric (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
6 | Tim Gorschluter (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-08-24 | |||
7 | Julian Loose (until 2014-06-30) | 1985-05-17 | |||
14 | Henning Grieneisen (until 2014-06-30) | 1984-09-09 | |||
15 | Marko Karamarko (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-03-27 | |||
16 | Benjamin Wingerter (until 2013-06-30) | 1983-03-25 | |||
17 | Timo Kunert (until 2013-09-01) | 1987-03-12 | |||
18 | Julian Westermann (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-04-19 | |||
19 | Julian Buscher (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-09-15) | 1993-04-22 | |||
22 | Christian Rasche (from 2013-01-21) (until 2013-08-26) | 1992-10-18 | |||
26 | Danijel Gataric (until 2014-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
28 | Sofien Chahed (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-11-22 | |||
31 | Oliver Zech (until 2012-08-23) | 1987-01-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Kevin Freiberger (from 2013-01-31) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-11-16 | |||
9 | Aleksandar Kotuljac (until 2014-06-30) | 1981-11-02 | |||
10 | Dennis Schmidt (from 2012-08-24) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-18 | |||
11 | Roman Prokoph (until 2013-06-30) | 1985-08-06 | |||
13 | Amir Shapourzadeh (until 2014-06-30) | 1982-09-19 | |||
19 | Danny Radke (until 2013-01-31) | 1993-08-17 | |||
22 | Simon Engelmann (until 2012-12-31) | 1989-03-22 | |||
23 | Marcus Fischer (until 2013-06-30) | 1980-08-12 | |||
25 | Alessandro Beccaria (from 2012-10-19) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-06-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2013-05-29 17:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2013-06-02 14:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |