Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Markus von Ahlen (from 2012-12-20) (until 2013-06-30) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Alexander Schmidt (until 2012-11-17) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Felix Ruml (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-04-26 | ||||
Felix Junghan (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-09-04 | ||||
Timo Ochs (from 2012-08-08) (until 2013-01-22) | 1981-10-17 | ||||
1 | Kai Fritz (from 2013-02-10) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-06-19 | |||
30 | Vitus Eicher (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-11-05 | |||
33 | Michael Netolitzky (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-01-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Phillipp Steinhart (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | ||||
Manuel Buhler (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-06 | ||||
Christoph Rech (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-04-29 | ||||
Necat Aygun (from 2013-03-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1980-02-26 | ||||
Alexandros Tanidis (from 2013-01-01) (until 2014-01-07) | 1991-10-23 | ||||
Christoph Dinkelbach (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-02-10 | ||||
Chris Wolf (until 2013-06-30) | 1991-02-23 | ||||
Robert Zeus (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-03-17 | ||||
Christopher Schindler (until 2013-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | ||||
Arne Feick (from 2013-03-01) (until 2013-06-30) | 1988-04-01 | ||||
16 | Peter Kurzweg (from 2013-05-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-02-10 | |||
23 | Benjamin Schwarz (until 2012-12-31) | 1986-07-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kodjovi Koussou (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-06-22 | ||||
Andreas Geipl (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-04-21 | ||||
Stefan Wannenwetsch (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-01-19 | ||||
Liridon Vocaj (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-10-01 | ||||
Mike Ott (from 2012-11-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | ||||
Dennis Vatany (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-06-07 | ||||
Tobias Killer (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-08-20 | ||||
Gianni Gotthardt (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-08-20 | ||||
Sebastian Maier (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-09-18 | ||||
Grigoris Makos (from 2013-03-23) (until 2013-04-30) | 1987-01-18 | ||||
Denis Bushuev (until 2012-11-17) | 1982-02-15 | ||||
7 | Maximilian Knuth (until 2012-08-06) | 1989-05-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Bobby Wood (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-11-15 | ||||
Daniel Jais (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-02-24 | ||||
Ivan Knezevic (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-14 | ||||
Markus Ziereis (until 2013-06-30) | 1992-08-26 | ||||
Simon Motz (until 2013-06-30) | 1993-06-17 | ||||
Robert Glatzel (until 2013-06-30) | 1994-01-08 | ||||
Ola Kamara (from 2013-03-01) (until 2013-04-30) | 1989-10-15 | ||||
Jann George (from 2013-01-01) (until 2013-03-31) | 1992-07-31 | ||||
20 | Nico Karger (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2013-05-29 18:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2013-06-04 20:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |