Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Schmidt (until 2015-02-16) | 1967-04-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christian Mathenia (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-03-31 | ||||
Loris Karius (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-06-22 | ||||
Christian Wetklo (from 2013-12-07) (until 2013-12-31) | 1980-01-11 | ||||
1 | Jannik Huth (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
1 | Robin Zentner (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-10-28 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Manuel Schneider (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-20 | ||||
Benedikt Saller (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-09-22 | ||||
Stefan Bell (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-08-24 | ||||
Marcel Seegert (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-29 | ||||
David Kinsombi (from 2013-09-15) (until 2014-06-30) | 1995-12-12 | ||||
Malik Fathi (until 2014-06-30) | 1983-10-29 | ||||
2 | Jean Nadjombe | 2001-09-06 | |||
2 | Tobias Schilk (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-03-24 | |||
4 | Tevin Ihrig (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-10 | |||
4 | Damian Rossbach (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-02-27 | |||
5 | Fabian Kalig (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-03-28 | |||
47 | Malte Moos (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-02-02 | |||
50 | Julian Koch (from 2014-02-01) (until 2015-01-04) | 1990-11-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dennis Schmitt (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-05-27 | ||||
Robin Garnier (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-05-13 | ||||
Steven Lewerenz (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-05-18 | ||||
Nico Seegert (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-04-29 | ||||
Yunus Malli (from 2013-09-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-24 | ||||
Julian Baumgartlinger (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-01-02 | ||||
Marcel Karcher (until 2014-01-30) | 1994-04-04 | ||||
Lucas Roser (until 2014-01-14) | 1993-12-28 | ||||
Christoph Moritz (from 2013-12-01) (until 2013-12-31) | 1990-01-27 | ||||
Nico Zwimpfer (until 2013-08-31) | 1993-07-06 | ||||
Nico Pfrengle (until 2013-07-09) | 1992-01-12 | ||||
3 | Felix Muller (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-01-27 | |||
5 | Richard Weil (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-02-06 | |||
8 | Daniel Bohl (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-06-09 | |||
8 | Christoph Moritz (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
11 | Dennis Franzin (from 2014-01-15) (until 2017-01-18) | 1993-07-12 | |||
16 | Stephane Eba Eba (from 2013-11-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-11-18 | |||
20 | Tim Fahrenholz (until 2015-01-22) | 1994-03-22 | |||
24 | Michael Falkenmayer (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-11-26 | |||
28 | Todor Nedelew (from 2014-01-01) (until 2016-01-22) | 1993-02-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sebastian Polter (from 2013-09-28) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-04-01 | ||||
Dani Schahin (from 2013-11-24) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | ||||
Shawn Parker (from 2013-11-24) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | ||||
Aaron Seydel (until 2014-06-30) | 1996-02-07 | ||||
Nejmeddin Daghfous (until 2014-01-29) | 1986-10-01 | ||||
Nikita Rukavytsya (from 2013-08-11) (until 2013-08-31) | 1987-06-22 | ||||
- | Petar Sliskovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
9 | Mounir Bouziane (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2014-05-28 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-06-01 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |