Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Brdaric (until 2014-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Marco Weisshaupt (until 2014-06-30) | 1972-06-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Benjamin Lowens (from 2014-01-21) (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-08-31 | |||
1 | Christoph Haker (until 2013-12-31) | 1991-02-06 | |||
21 | Daniel Bittner (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
31 | Paul Buschke (until 2014-06-30) | 1994-05-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lukas Novy (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-12-17 | |||
3 | Christian Schonwalder (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-01-09 | |||
4 | Thomas Franke (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-01-21 | |||
7 | Dmytro Fomin (from 2013-07-25) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-08-30 | |||
10 | Ersan Parlatan (until 2015-06-30) | 1977-08-01 | |||
13 | Rico Morack (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-02-18 | |||
16 | Rene Putt (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-27 | |||
18 | Markus Kaiser (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-11-08 | |||
19 | Matthias Zeugner (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Ingo Wunderlich (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-06-18 | |||
8 | Kai Hempel (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-02-06 | |||
9 | Tony Fuchs (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-06-11 | |||
10 | Erich Sautner (from 2014-01-27) (until 2014-06-30) | 1991-11-06 | |||
11 | Alexander Morosow (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-07-19 | |||
17 | Christian Skoda (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-10-10 | |||
20 | Dino Medjedovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-06-13 | |||
23 | Hugo Lopes (from 2013-07-23) (until 2014-06-30) | 1988-08-25 | |||
27 | Kevin Weidlich (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1989-10-04 | |||
78 | Volkan Cekirdek (from 2014-01-01) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Salvatore Rogoli (until 2014-01-06) | 1980-11-20 | |||
14 | Abiola Folarin (from 2013-07-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-07-13 | |||
17 | Junior Torunarigha (until 2013-08-01) | 1990-04-18 | |||
28 | Christopher Mandiangu (from 2013-08-07) (until 2014-06-30) | 1992-02-08 | |||
33 | Nicolas Hebisch (from 2014-01-29) (until 2014-06-30) | 1990-03-26 | |||
36 | Velimir Jovanovic (until 2014-06-30) | 1987-08-25 | |||
39 | Sargis Adamjan (from 2014-01-30) (until 2014-06-30) | 1993-05-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2014-05-28 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2014-06-01 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |