Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jens Hartel (until 2018-11-12) | 1969-06-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Matthias Tischer (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-11-09 | |||
12 | Jan Glinker (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
30 | Lukas Cichos (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-12-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Nico Hammann (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
3 | Christopher Handke (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
4 | Silvio Bankert (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-06-13 | |||
5 | Felix Schiller (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-12-06 | |||
6 | Fabian Zittlau (from 2015-01-08) (until 2015-03-31) | 1990-06-22 | |||
6 | Christopher Reinhard (until 2015-02-01) | 1985-05-19 | |||
8 | Steffen Puttkammer (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-09-30 | |||
16 | Nils Butzen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-02 | |||
20 | Rene Lange (until 2015-06-30) | 1988-11-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
- | Tarek Chahed (from 2015-03-23) (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-06-23 | |||
10 | Marcel Schlosser (until 2015-08-20) | 1987-08-08 | |||
14 | Niklas Brandt (from 2014-07-08) (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-11-22 | |||
21 | Sven Reimann (until 2016-01-21) | 1994-05-17 | |||
22 | Morris Schroter (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-08-20 | |||
26 | Torge Bremer (until 2015-08-28) | 1994-09-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Lars Fuchs (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-06-21 | |||
9 | Matthias Steinborn (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-03-05 | |||
11 | Christian Beck (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-03-10 | |||
13 | Christoph Siefkes (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-02-20 | |||
15 | Kevin Kruschke (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-19 | |||
17 | Marius Sowislo (until 2018-06-30) | 1982-11-14 | |||
18 | Nicolas Hebisch (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-05-27 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-31 14:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |