Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sven Demandt (until 2015-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Janis Blaswich (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-05-02 | |||
29 | Niklas Bolten (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-03-29 | |||
30 | Martin Kompalla (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-08-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Steffen Nkansah (from 2015-01-06) (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-04-07 | ||||
2 | Joel Mero (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-02-07 | |||
3 | Christopher Lenz (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-22 | |||
4 | Gino van den Berg (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-06-04 | |||
4 | Tim Knipping (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-11-24 | |||
7 | Malte Berauer (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-19 | |||
17 | Leonel Kadiata (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-11-04 | |||
23 | Oliver Stang (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-06-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mahmoud Dahoud (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | ||||
- | Nico Brandenburger (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
5 | Benjamin Barg (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-09-15 | |||
6 | Michel Lieder (from 2015-01-06) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-03-13 | |||
7 | Benno Mohr (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-18 | |||
8 | Enes Topal (until 2015-08-12) | 1995-10-28 | |||
10 | Leroy Mickels (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-06-25 | |||
12 | Marvin Schulz (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-15 | |||
15 | Bilal Sezer (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-25 | |||
19 | Kevin Holzweiler (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-10-16 | |||
20 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-06-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Gianluca Rizzo (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-11-06 | ||||
9 | Mario Rodriguez (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-05-12 | |||
11 | Kwame Yeboah (until 2018-01-22) | 1994-06-02 | |||
18 | Giuseppe Pisano (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-04-26 | |||
21 | Patrick Guier (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
24 | Sinan Kurt (until 2014-08-30) | 1996-07-23 | |||
36 | Marlon Ritter (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-10-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-05-27 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-31 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |