Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rico Schmitt (until 2016-01-24) | 1968-09-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lucas Menz (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-10-29 | |||
16 | Daniel Endres (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-05-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
5 | Giuliano Modica (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
8 | Maik Vetter (from 2014-08-25) (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-09-06 | |||
15 | Alexis Theodosiadis (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-12-19 | |||
17 | Stefano Maier (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-12-04 | |||
21 | Marcel Wilke (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-06-26 | |||
23 | Dennis Schulte (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-07-05 | |||
27 | Sascha Korb (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Klaus Gjasula (until 2016-01-03) | 1989-12-14 | |||
6 | Matthias Schwarz (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-12-28 | |||
7 | Kevin Wittke (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-08-17 | |||
8 | Maik Vetter (from 2014-08-25) (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-06 | |||
9 | Benjamin Pintol (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-05-19 | |||
11 | Fabian Backer (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-05-28 | |||
13 | Jan Biggel (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
20 | Martin Roser (from 2014-08-29) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
26 | Gabriel Gallus (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
29 | Baris Yakut (until 2015-07-31) | 1994-08-12 | |||
30 | Denis Mangafic (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-12-12 | |||
33 | Modjieb Jamali (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-04-30 | |||
34 | Robin Scheu (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-02-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
14 | Christian Cappek (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-07-25 | |||
22 | Steven von der Burg (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-07-29 | |||
25 | Mohamed Tahiri (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-09-19 | |||
31 | Markus Muller (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-05-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-05-27 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-31 14:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |