Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alexander Nouri (from 2014-10-25) (until 2016-09-18) | 1979-08-20 | ||||
Viktor Skripnik (until 2014-10-25) | 1969-11-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
22 | Tobias Duffner (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-12-05 | |||
30 | Michael Zetterer (from 2015-01-27) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | |||
30 | Richard Strebinger (until 2015-01-27) | 1993-02-14 | |||
33 | Florian Urbainski (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-10-07 | |||
40 | Raif Husic (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-05 | |||
40 | Kevin Otremba (until 2014-07-23) | 1994-06-18 | |||
43 | Eric Oelschlagel (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Janek Sternberg (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-10-19 | |||
4 | Julian Dudda (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-04-08 | |||
4 | Oliver Husing (until 2015-01-28) | 1993-02-17 | |||
5 | Angelos Argyris (from 2015-02-02) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-05-06 | |||
6 | Leon Guwara (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | |||
13 | Herbert Bockhorn (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-31 | |||
18 | Leon Lingerski (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-05-03 | |||
19 | Luca Zander (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
31 | Torben Rehfeldt (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-08-07 | |||
38 | Marnon Busch (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-08 | |||
39 | Lukas Frode (until 2017-01-01) | 1995-01-23 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Florian Bruns (until 2015-06-30) | 1979-08-21 | |||
14 | Maximilian Eggestein (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-12-08 | |||
15 | Philipp Eggersgluss (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
17 | Ozkan Yildirim (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-04-10 | |||
17 | Pedro Guthermann (until 2015-06-30) | 1996-12-06 | |||
21 | Levent Aycicek (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-02-12 | |||
24 | Patrick Mainka (from 2014-07-17) (until 2016-01-05) | 1994-11-06 | |||
26 | Julian von Haacke (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-02-14 | |||
27 | Florian Grillitsch (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-08-07 | |||
37 | Marcel Hilssner (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | |||
39 | Tobias Schwede (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Onur Capin (from 2014-08-20) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-07-10 | |||
9 | Davie Selke (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | |||
9 | Ousman Manneh (from 2015-01-01) (until 2015-06-30) | 1997-03-10 | |||
9 | Martin Kobylanski (until 2014-08-27) | 1994-03-08 | |||
11 | Melvyn Lorenzen (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-11-26 | |||
16 | Maik Lukowicz (until 2015-06-30) | 1995-02-01 | |||
28 | Enis Bytyqi (until 2015-06-30) | 1997-02-18 | |||
36 | Max Wegner (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-03-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-05-27 19:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-31 14:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |