Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 2017-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
25 | Andre Koob (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-08-01 | |||
28 | Robert Wulnikowski (until 2017-06-30) | 1977-07-11 | |||
34 | Mario Miltner (from 2014-10-15) (until 2015-06-30) | 1990-12-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dominik Nothnagel (until 2017-01-09) | 1994-12-28 | |||
4 | Kostadin Welkow (until 2015-06-30) | 1989-03-26 | |||
5 | Clemens Schoppenhauer (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-23 | |||
6 | Niklas Weissenberger (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-05-13 | |||
17 | Sebastian Sonnenberger (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-01-22 | |||
21 | Christian Demirtas (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
22 | Pascal Bieler (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-02-26 | |||
32 | Lukas Billick (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Dennis Schmitt (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-27 | |||
7 | Marco Haller (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
8 | Liridon Vocaj (from 2014-07-21) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-10-01 | |||
9 | Amir Shapourzadeh (until 2016-12-31) | 1982-09-19 | |||
14 | Joannis Karsanidis (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-25 | |||
18 | Nico Gutjahr (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-05-15 | |||
19 | Adrian Istrefi (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
20 | Manuel Duhnke (until 2015-01-28) | 1987-08-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Steven Lewerenz (until 2015-07-24) | 1991-05-18 | |||
11 | Corvin Behrens (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-08-19 | |||
23 | Fabian Weiss (from 2015-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-23 | |||
24 | Sebastian Fries (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-01-24 | |||
26 | Daniel Diroll (until 2015-06-30) | 1992-02-26 | |||
27 | Adam Jabiri (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-06-03 | |||
37 | Christopher Bieber (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2015-05-27 19:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2015-05-31 14:00 |
6 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |