Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Marco Antwerpen (until 2017-12-11) | 1971-10-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Philipp Kuhn (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-03-29 | ||||
1 | Nico Pellatz (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-07-08 | |||
23 | Alexander Monath (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-08-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Markus Brzenska (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
3 | Sascha Eichmeier (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-01-02 | |||
11 | Michael Lejan (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | |||
15 | Daniel Reiche (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-14 | |||
21 | Andre Wallenborn (until 2019-01-23) | 1995-03-25 | |||
28 | Patrick Koronkiewicz | 1991-03-13 | |||
36 | Dominik Lanius (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Felix Backszat (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-09-13 | |||
6 | Tim Jerat (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-03-05 | |||
7 | Florian Heister (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-03-02 | |||
8 | Mike Wunderlich (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-03-25 | |||
13 | Lukas Nottbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-10-22 | |||
17 | Marcel Gottschling (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-05-14 | |||
19 | Kevin Holzweiler (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-10-16 | |||
21 | Andrejs Ciganiks (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-04-12 | |||
22 | Timm Golley (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-17 | |||
25 | Edwin Schwarz (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | |||
30 | Marco Fiore (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
31 | Mehdi Reichert (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-12-18 | |||
35 | Hamza Saghiri (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-02-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | David Jansen (until 2017-07-25) | 1987-12-04 | |||
10 | Fatih Candan (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
20 | Sven Kreyer (until 2020-07-05) | 1991-05-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-05-28 14:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 2017-06-01 17:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |