Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dirk Lottner (until 2019-12-02) | 1972-03-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Batz (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-12 | |||
20 | Ricco Cymer (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
26 | Patrik Herbrand (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-06-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Kilian Staroscik (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-06-21 | ||||
3 | Oliver Oschkenat (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-12-22 | |||
4 | Alexandre Mendy (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-12-14 | |||
6 | Marlon Krause (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-09-01 | |||
19 | Sascha Wenninger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-06 | |||
21 | Dominic Rau (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-11-29 | |||
23 | Mario Muller (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
29 | Pierre Fassnacht (until 2019-01-22) | 1996-01-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Steven Zellner (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-03-14 | |||
7 | Martin Dausch (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-03-04 | |||
8 | Manuel Zeitz (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-08-01 | |||
10 | Markus Obernosterer (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-04-14 | |||
11 | Markus Mendler (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-01-07 | |||
14 | Marco Holz (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-01-31 | |||
17 | Fanol Perdedaj (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-07-16 | |||
17 | Johannes Rossfeld (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-05-27 | |||
25 | Tobias Janicke (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-16 | |||
31 | Lukas Quirin (until 2019-09-02) | 1999-10-22 | |||
32 | Jordan Steiner (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-10 | |||
33 | Marco Kehl-Gomez (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-05-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Patrick Schmidt (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-10 | |||
13 | Maurice Deville (until 2022-01-30) | 1992-07-31 | |||
13 | Christoph Fenninger (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-05-12 | |||
16 | Kevin Behrens (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-02-03 | |||
18 | Marwin Studtrucker (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-04-29 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jacob (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-06-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2018-05-24 17:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-05-27 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |