Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Bierofka (until 2019-11-05) | 1979-02-07 | ||||
Oliver Beer (from 2018-05-12) (until 2018-05-12) | 1979-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marco Hiller | 1997-02-20 | |||
30 | Johann Hipper (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-09-30 | |||
37 | Alexander Strobl (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-02-22 | |||
39 | Hendrik Bonmann (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-01-22 | |||
40 | Tom Kretzschmar (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-01-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Eric Weeger (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-02-02 | |||
3 | Sebastian Koch (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-01-01 | |||
4 | Felix Weber (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-01-18 | |||
6 | Jan Mauersberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-06-17 | |||
11 | Christian Koppel (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-11-03 | |||
17 | Daniel Wein (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-02-05 | |||
19 | Lukas Aigner (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-04-19 | |||
22 | Aaron Berzel (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-05-29 | |||
25 | Lucas Genkinger (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-14 | |||
36 | Phillipp Steinhart (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | |||
44 | Leon Klassen (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-05-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Nicolas Andermatt (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-11-06 | |||
8 | Simon Seferings (until 2019-01-31) | 1995-07-05 | |||
10 | Timo Gebhart (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-04-12 | |||
14 | Dennis Dressel (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-10-26 | |||
16 | Benjamin Kindsvater (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-08 | |||
27 | Michael Gorlitz (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-03-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sascha Molders (until 2021-12-19) | 1985-03-20 | |||
18 | Nico Karger (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-01 | |||
20 | Tobias Steer (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
21 | Ugur Mustafa Turk (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-24 | |||
23 | Nicholas Helmbrecht (until 2019-01-31) | 1995-01-30 | |||
24 | Markus Ziereis (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-08-26 | |||
31 | Kodjovi Koussou (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-06-22 | |||
33 | Felix Bachschmid (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-09-25 | |||
54 | Mohamad Awata (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Gyorgy Hursan (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-05 | ||||
Martin Gambos (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 2018-05-24 17:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2018-05-27 14:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |