Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Holger Seitz (until 2019-06-30) | 1974-07-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dirk Teschke (until 2021-06-30) | 1969-04-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ron Thorben Hoffmann (until 2021-08-31) | 1999-04-04 | |||
12 | Maurice Konig (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-21 | |||
22 | Michael Netolitzky (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-01-12 | |||
36 | Christian Fruchtl (until 2020-08-06) | 2000-01-28 | |||
37 | Michael Wagner (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-26 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Mert Yilmaz (until 2020-09-29) | 1999-03-08 | |||
3 | Angelo Mayer (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-09-10 | |||
5 | Nicolas Feldhahn (until 2022-06-30) | 1986-08-14 | |||
13 | Kilian Senkbeil (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-22 | |||
14 | Theo Rieg (until 2020-07-05) | 1999-10-25 | |||
20 | Resul Turkkalesi (until 2020-07-05) | 1998-08-03 | |||
22 | Lars Lukas Mai (until 2020-07-21) | 2000-03-31 | |||
25 | Maxime Awoudja (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-02 | |||
26 | Jonathan Meier (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-11-11 | |||
27 | Derrick Kohn (until 2020-07-05) | 1999-02-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alphonso Davies (until 2020-07-05) | 2000-11-02 | ||||
6 | Paul Will (until 2020-08-22) | 1999-03-01 | |||
7 | Woo-Yeong Jeong (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-09-20 | |||
8 | Jannik Rochelt (until 2021-02-02) | 1998-09-27 | |||
9 | Alphonso Davies (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-11-02 | |||
11 | Maximilian Franzke (until 2020-01-21) | 1999-03-05 | |||
16 | Meritan Shabani (until 2019-08-08) | 1999-03-15 | |||
18 | Maximilian Zaiser (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-03-08 | |||
19 | Maximilian Welzmuller (until 2022-08-22) | 1990-01-10 | |||
30 | Torben Rhein (until 2020-07-05) | 2003-01-12 | |||
42 | Marcel Zylla (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-01-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Oliver Batista Meier (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-02-16 | ||||
10 | Kwasi Wriedt (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-07-10 | |||
21 | Michael Strein (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-05 | |||
23 | Mathis Lange (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-06 | |||
24 | Alexander Nollenberger (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-06-04 | |||
29 | Justin Butler (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-03-23 | |||
35 | Joshua Zirkzee (until 2021-01-31) | 2001-05-22 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Franck Evina (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-07-05 | ||||
Timothy Tillman (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-04 | ||||
8 | Adrian Fein (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2019-05-22 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-05-26 16:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |