Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudiger Ziehl (until 2020-06-30) | 1977-10-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Niklas Klinger (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-10-13 | |||
12 | Nico Pellatz (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-07-08 | |||
28 | Jannes Tasche (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-20 | |||
36 | Phillip Menzel (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-08-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marcel Tisserand (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-01-10 | ||||
Sebastian Jung (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | ||||
2 | Davide-Jerome Itter (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-01-05 | |||
4 | Julian Klamt (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-08-22 | |||
5 | Robin Ziegele (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-13 | |||
13 | Adrian Goransch (until 2020-01-03) | 1999-01-25 | |||
14 | Jannis Heuer (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-29 | |||
15 | Abdallah El-Haibi (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-06 | |||
35 | Gian-Luca Itter (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
John Yeboah (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-06-23 | ||||
3 | Dominik Franke (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-10-05 | |||
6 | Jan Neuwirt (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-18 | |||
9 | Charles-Jesaja Herrmann (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-02-08 | |||
10 | Murat Saglam (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-10 | |||
16 | Iba May (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-06-06 | |||
21 | Kentu Malcolm Badu (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-06-23 | |||
23 | Michele Rizzi (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-04-13 | |||
24 | Anton Stach (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-11-15 | |||
26 | Yannik Moker (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-07-27 | |||
27 | Amara Conde (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-06 | |||
37 | Elvis Rexhbecaj (until 2020-01-06) | 1997-11-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Omar Marmoush (until 2021-01-05) | 1999-02-07 | |||
8 | Marcel Stutter (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-03-06 | |||
9 | Blaz Kramer (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-06-01 | |||
11 | Luca Horn (until 2020-09-30) | 1998-12-19 | |||
18 | Julian Justvan (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-02 | |||
19 | Richmond Tachie (until 2019-08-13) | 1999-04-21 | |||
20 | Daniel Hanslik (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-10-06 | |||
22 | Amir Abdijanovic (until 2021-06-30) | 2001-03-03 | |||
25 | Max Peter Klump (until 2020-01-31) | 1999-03-12 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Anton Donkor (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-11-11 | ||||
Alper Kara (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-07-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 2019-05-22 19:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 2019-05-26 16:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |