Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Welz (until 1983-06-30) | 1945-02-01 | ||||
Klaus Schmidt (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-01-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Brocker (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-21 | ||||
Gerd Wirtz (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Ralf Quabeck (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-09-30 | ||||
Uwe Brock (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-07-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Horstgen (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-08-18 | ||||
Horst-Franz Degen (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-11-07 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Wloka (until 1985-06-30) | 1951-09-12 | ||||
Dieter Allig (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-08-06 | ||||
Dieter Bartel (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-10-15 | ||||
Jurgen Suchanek (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Lothar Schneider (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-12-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Burkhard Segler (until 1985-06-30) | 1951-03-05 | ||||
Norbert Runge (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-07-08 | ||||
Rainer Jakobs (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-02-01 | ||||
Joachim Herbst (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-08-25 | ||||
Detlev Szymanek (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-04-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1983-05-29 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1983-06-01 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-06-04 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1983-06-12 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1983-06-15 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-06-18 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |