Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Muller (until 1985-06-30) | 1939-06-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Horst Bertram (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-11-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Tilner (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-08-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Friedhelm Schutte (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-08-12 | ||||
Lothar Schulz (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-01-04 | ||||
Guido Mazany (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Detlef Meyer (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-08-10 | ||||
Claus Gebauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-15 | ||||
Gerhard Pecl (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Holz (until 1989-06-30) | 1952-09-27 | ||||
Wolfgang Reichel (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-18 | ||||
Dirk Heitkamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-02-14 | ||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Rene Notten (until 1985-03-15) | 1949-11-20 | ||||
Klaus Hassenberg (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-10-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Tonnies (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-12-19 | ||||
Leo Ricken (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-08-01 | ||||
Joachim Herbst (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-08-25 | ||||
Ralf Augustin (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Jurgen Nabrotzki (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-12-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-05-27 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1984-05-31 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1984-06-03 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-06-06 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-06-12 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-06-16 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1984-06-21 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1984-06-24 00:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |