Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Patzke (from 1983-09-21) (until 1984-09-30) | 1943-03-14 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1983-09-20) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Zander (until 1987-06-30) | 1951-08-10 | ||||
Peter Sirch (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | ||||
Gerald Hillringhaus (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-06-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Klaus Seidel (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Roland Sobek (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-01-26 | ||||
Peter Gebele (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-02-05 | ||||
Gunther Enhuber (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-08-28 | ||||
Michael Hecht (until 1984-06-30) | 1965-04-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joachim Goldstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Kurt Eigl (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-03-07 | ||||
Paul Schonwetter (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-11-15 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Norbert Paulus (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-04-28 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Andreas Lobmann (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-02-20 | ||||
Helmut Schmitz (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-03-28 | ||||
Jurgen Korus (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-01-14 | ||||
Ludwig Kogl (until 1984-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | ||||
Rainer Bauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1965-05-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-05-27 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1984-05-31 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-06-02 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-06-09 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-06-16 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1984-06-24 00:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |