Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erhard Ahmann (until 1985-08-13) | 1941-05-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Seiler (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-08-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Gellrich (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Andreas Helmer (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-02-25 | ||||
Neale Marmon (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-04-21 | ||||
Ulf Metschies (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-09-22 | ||||
Gunter Eymold (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-04-17 | ||||
Oskar Bauer (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-09-24 | ||||
Willi Brocks (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-01-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Heskamp (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Michael Kalkbrenner (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-07-01 | ||||
Frank Bohne (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-08-22 | ||||
Jochen Goll (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-02-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Paul Linz (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Gerd Grau (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-07-19 | ||||
Ralf Feuerstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-06-16 | ||||
Paul Jaschke (until 1986-12-31) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Sandhowe (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-12-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-05-26 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1985-05-28 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-06-01 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1985-06-09 00:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-06-12 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-06-15 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-06-19 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-06-26 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |