Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Lorkowski (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-02-26 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Helmut Schulte (until 1987-11-10) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Reinhard Kock (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-09-04 | ||||
Dietmar Demuth (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Jurgen Roloff (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-08-04 | ||||
Thomas Hinz (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-02-06 | ||||
Michael Streich (until 1986-06-30) | 1966-05-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Dahms (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-12-22 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Bargfrede (until 1989-12-31) | 1959-03-10 | ||||
Stefan Studer (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-01-30 | ||||
Jens Beermann (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-05-04 | ||||
Joachim Pawlik (until 1986-06-30) | 1965 | ||||
Mathias Bruszies (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-05-21 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andre Golke (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Thomas Oldenburg (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1986-05-21 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-05-24 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1986-05-29 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1986-06-05 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1986-06-08 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-06-11 00:00 |
1 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-06-14 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-06-21 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |