Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1991-06-30) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Rainer Zobel (until 1990-06-30) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Hain (until 1992-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Gorski (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-10-04 | ||||
Michael Scheike (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-11 | ||||
Michael Wilke (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | ||||
Andreas Kubsda (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-15 | ||||
Nils Schmaler (until 1988-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 1993-01-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Peer Posipal (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-07-03 | ||||
Eduard Buckmaier (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-06-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Buchheister (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Andreas Pospich (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-12-08 | ||||
Werner Dressel (from 1988-01-01) (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-08-30 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1989-06-30) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Olaf Schmaler (until 1988-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
Ivan Savic (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-03-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1988-05-18 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-05-25 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-05-29 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-06-02 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-05 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-12 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-06-16 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-19 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |