Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1989-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Heribert Macherey (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-11-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Notthoff (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-26 | ||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Oswald Semlits (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-06-07 | ||||
Jorg Kessen (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Michael Telljohann (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | ||||
Ralf Zils (until 1990-06-30) | 1969-05-25 | ||||
Andreas Haremski (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-07-05 | ||||
Karl Rohr (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-07-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Toni Puszamszies (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-08-14 | ||||
Uwe Kober (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-04-24 | ||||
Mike Vossnacke (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-03 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Werner Malischke (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Ralf Kessen (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
Peter Gemein (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-09-14 | ||||
Michael Bruhl (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-10-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1992-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Michael Tonnies (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-12-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1988-05-18 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1988-05-21 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1988-05-24 00:00 |
2 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-05-29 00:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-06-05 00:00 |
0 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-06-08 00:00 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1988-06-08 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1988-06-16 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |